Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Érico Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1928Born
7 Oct 195123.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 197143.1AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jun 197143.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jun 197143.2InstalledBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 Apr 197345.1DiedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Érico Ferrari
Bishop Érico Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Maria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Palma

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018