Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederico Didonet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1910Born
15 Dec 193524.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 197160.5AppointedBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Sep 197160.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Aug 198675.6RetiredBishop of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Oct 198877.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Frederico Didonet
Bishop Frederico Didonet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio Grande

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. José de Ivora
Ordained BishopRio Grande, Diocese of Rio Grande, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 785
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast