Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pedro Eggerath, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1880BornAlemanha, Germany
10 Apr 189818.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Aug 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Oct 191535.7AppointedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
13 May 192141.2AppointedPrelate of Rio Branco, Brazil
27 Sep 192343.6AppointedOfficial of Order of Saint Benedict
Jul 192949.4ResignedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Jul 192949.4ResignedPrelate of Rio Branco, Brazil
Jul 192949.4ResignedOfficial of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 194767.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Eggerath:
Abbot Pedro Eggerath O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 45.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015