Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilmar Santin, O. Carm.

Prelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1952 Born
2 Feb 197320.2ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Dec 197927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Dec 201058.1AppointedPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil
19 Mar 201158.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil
10 Apr 201158.4InstalledPrelate of Itaituba, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Wilmar Santin
Bishop Wilmar Santin O. Carm. (born ) Prelate of Itaituba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Londrina

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Itaituba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,965

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017