Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Félix Mugnol

Deceased

Bishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1915Born
30 Nov 194125.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 196650.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Feb 196650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
24 Apr 196650.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives
15 Jan 196953.0AppointedBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Feb 198266.1DiedBishop of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Angelo Félix Mugnol
Bishop Angelo Félix Mugnol (born , died ) Bishop of Bagé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFarroupilha

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018