Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacinto Bergmann

Archbishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1951 BornAlto Feliz
20 Oct 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 May 200250.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 May 200250.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
14 Jul 200250.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
15 Jun 200452.6AppointedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
1 Jul 200957.7AppointedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Apr 201159.5AppointedArchbishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Bergmann:
Archbishop Jacinto Bergmann (born ) Archbishop of Pelotas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pelotas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013