Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Gelain

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1910BornNova Padua
28 Oct 193525.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 194434.1AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
10 Dec 194434.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
22 May 194837.9AppointedBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
22 Aug 194838.2InstalledBishop of Cafelândia, Brazil
28 Mar 196453.8AppointedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Feb 198675.6RetiredBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
31 Dec 199383.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Gelain:
Bishop Henrique Gelain (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013