Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Vicente Bernetti, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1934Born
25 Mar 195521.0ProfessedMember of Agostiniani Scalzi
1 Jun 195824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
12 Jun 199662.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
12 Jun 199662.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rufiniana
25 Aug 199662.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rufiniana
2 Feb 200570.8AppointedBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
8 Jul 200975.2RetiredBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
11 Aug 201783.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Vicente Bernetti
Bishop Luiz Vicente Bernetti O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apucarana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonzano
Ordained PriestFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Ordained BishopAmpére
Death PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,842
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast