Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celso Antônio Marchiori

Bishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1958 Born
6 Mar 198829.5Ordained PriestPriest of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
8 Jul 200950.9AppointedBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
28 Aug 200951.0Ordained BishopBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
2 Oct 200951.1InstalledBishop of Apucarana, Parana, Brazil
13 Dec 201759.3AppointedBishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Celso Antônio Marchiori
Bishop Celso Antônio Marchiori (born ) Bishop of São José dos Pinhais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Largo, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Luz, Cathedral, Curitiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São José dos Pinhais.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,263
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018