Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Osório Bebber, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1929 BornFlores da Cunha
13 Feb 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Nov 197950.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
2 Mar 198050.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Sep 198152.2SucceededBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Jan 199262.6AppointedPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
17 Mar 199969.7AppointedBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
9 Apr 200373.8ResignedBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Osório Bebber:
Bishop Osório Bebber O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Joaçaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joaçaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015