Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Sbalchiero Neto, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1953BornSananduva
4 Feb 198026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
8 Jan 200349.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Apr 200349.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Apr 200349.3InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 200349.9SucceededBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Jul 200753.6DiedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Sbalchiero Neto:
Bishop Pedro Sbalchiero Neto M.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Vacaria

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,362
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013