Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Calogero Lauricella

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1919Born
12 Jun 194122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
13 May 196142.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
13 May 196142.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sela
24 Jun 196142.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sela
8 Sep 196445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cefal¨, Italy
196747.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cefal¨, Italy
4 Jun 197051.2AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
8 Sep 197354.5AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
20 Jun 198970.3DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calogero Lauricella
Archbishop Calogero Lauricella (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavanusa

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018