Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carmelo Ferraro

Archbishop Emeritus of Agrigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1932 BornS. Croce Camerina
3 Jul 195522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
30 Mar 197845.5AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
13 May 197845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
27 May 197845.7InstalledBishop of Patti, Italy
3 Nov 198856.1AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
10 Dec 198856.2InstalledBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Dec 200068.2AppointedArchbishop of Agrigento, Italy
23 Feb 200875.4RetiredArchbishop of Agrigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Ferraro:
Archbishop Carmelo Ferraro (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Agrigento

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agrigento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013