Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Checchinato

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1957 Born
4 Jul 198123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
13 Jan 201759.3AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
23 Apr 201759.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
6 May 201759.7InstalledBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Checchinato
Bishop Giovanni Checchinato (born ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLatina, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore, Church, Latina, Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Severo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2017
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Apr 2017