Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Scapinelli di Léguigno

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Laodicea ad Libanum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1908Born
10 Jun 193324.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 196253.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea ad Libanum
21 Sep 196253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea ad Libanum
30 Jun 197162.7DiedTitular Bishop of Laodicea ad Libanum

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Scapinelli di Léguigno
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Scapinelli di Léguigno (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Laodicea ad Libanum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerola Nuova

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast