Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Aglialoro

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo

Titular Bishop of Germa in Galatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1900BornVentimiglia Sicula
14 Apr 192322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
5 Oct 195756.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
5 Oct 195756.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
30 Nov 195756.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
9 Feb 197776.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
4 Feb 198887.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Aglialoro:
Bishop Filippo Aglialoro (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015