Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Petralia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1906BornBisacquino
7 Apr 192822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Monreale, Italy
14 Oct 196357.8AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
3 Nov 196357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 May 198074.3ResignedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
7 Jul 200094.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Petralia:
Bishop Giuseppe Petralia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 72.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013