Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Zambito

Bishop Emeritus of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1942 Born
3 Jul 196624.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 198947.2AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
29 Jun 198947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
22 Jul 198947.4InstalledBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Feb 201775.0RetiredBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Zambito
Bishop Ignazio Zambito (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Stefano Quisquina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Patti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,576
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017