Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Guglielmo Giombanco

Bishop-Elect of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1966 Born
7 Sep 199124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
1 Feb 201750.3AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
20 Apr 201750.5Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Giombanco (VIAF: 311412656)
Father Guglielmo Giombanco (born ) Bishop-Elect of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained PriestMadonna del Rosario (Chiesa Madre), Church, Piedimonte Etneo, Diocese of Acireale
Ordained BishopSantuario della Madonna, Tindari, Diocese of Patti

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Patti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017