Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Raspanti

Bishop of Acireale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1959 BornAlcamo
6 Mar 198222.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trapani, Italy
7 Sep 198223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trapani, Italy
26 Jul 201152.0AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
1 Oct 201152.2Ordained BishopBishop of Acireale, Italy
26 Sep 201556.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
4 Apr 201656.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Raspanti
Bishop Antonino Raspanti (born ) Bishop of Acireale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acireale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 26 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,153
  • ab: CB, 26 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Apr 2016