Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Micciché

Bishop Emeritus of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1943 BornS. Giuseppe Jato
28 Jun 196724.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 198845.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
23 Dec 198845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
24 Jan 198945.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
24 Jan 199854.6AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
19 May 201268.9RemovedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Micciché:
Bishop Francesco Micciché (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trapani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trapani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,241
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013