Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Corrado Mingo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1901BornRosolini
15 Aug 192523.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 195049.2AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
24 Feb 195149.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
28 Apr 196159.6AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
11 Mar 197876.5RetiredArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
16 May 198078.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Mingo:
Archbishop Corrado Mingo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015