Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cella, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1923Born
18 Dec 194824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
26 Jul 197551.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
26 Jul 197551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
7 Oct 197551.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
6 Jun 198157.4AppointedBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
6 Jun 198157.4AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
30 Sep 198662.7AppointedBishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy
9 Jul 199975.5RetiredBishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy
27 May 200884.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cella
Bishop Angelo Cella M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorgo al Monticano

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018