Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Cirrincione

Deceased

Bishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1926Born
16 Jul 195024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
21 Feb 198053.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
21 Feb 198053.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
12 Apr 198053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
8 Jan 198659.6AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
12 Feb 200275.7DiedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cirrincione
Bishop Vincenzo Cirrincione (born , died ) Bishop of Piazza Armerina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicari

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018