Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Di Cristina

Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1937 BornPalermo
2 Jul 196023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
23 Dec 200063.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
23 Dec 200063.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
26 Jan 200163.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
2 Dec 200669.7AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
23 Dec 200669.7InstalledArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
8 Feb 201375.8RetiredArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Di Cristina:
Archbishop Salvatore Di Cristina (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monreale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,889
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015