Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tortora, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1915Born
25 Jul 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
19 Mar 196247.1AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
19 Mar 196247.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
20 May 196247.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Livias
21 Oct 197257.7AppointedBishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
22 Sep 198873.6ResignedBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
17 Nov 198873.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tortora
Bishop Francesco Tortora O.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrecase

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018