Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald J. Herlihy

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1908BornKnocknagree
4 Apr 193122.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 196455.9AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
15 Nov 196456.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
2 Apr 198374.3DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Donald J. Herlihy:
Bishop Donald J. Herlihy (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013