Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis J. Moynihan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kerry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1885BornRathmore
13 Jun 190923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
5 Jul 194156.0AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
21 Sep 194156.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
10 Feb 195266.6AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
17 Jul 196984.0RetiredBishop of Kerry, Ireland
17 Jul 196984.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Suacia
10 Dec 197085.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Suacia
5 Dec 197590.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kerry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Denis J. Moynihan:
Bishop Denis J. Moynihan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kerry

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 52
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015