Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ahern

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cloyne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1911BornLeamlara
21 Jun 193624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
30 Mar 195745.6AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
9 Jun 195745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
17 Feb 198775.5RetiredBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
25 Sep 199786.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Ahern:
Bishop John Ahern (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cloyne

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013