Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael O’Brien

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1876BornArdconnaught
23 Jun 190125.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 192751.2AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
24 Jul 192751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
4 Oct 195276.5DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Brien:
Bishop Michael O’Brien (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013