Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick O’Neill

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1891Born
20 Jun 191524.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 194554.8AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
24 Feb 194655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
26 Mar 195867.1DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick O’Neill
Bishop Patrick O’Neill (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrange, Fedamore

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,946, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast