Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1912Born
21 Jun 193624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
1 Jul 195846.1AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
31 Aug 195846.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
8 Oct 197361.3DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Henry Murphy
Bishop Henry Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdpatrick

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Sep 2017