Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Migone

Deceased

Secret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1875Born
14 Aug 189823.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 193560.6AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
19 Dec 193560.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
19 Jan 193660.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
1 Jan 195175.6DiedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Migone
Archbishop Giuseppe Migone (born , died ) Secret Almoner of Papal Charities

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016