Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Decio Lucio Grandoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1928Born
22 Oct 195022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Todi, Italy
22 Jul 197244.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Foligno, Italy
22 Jul 197244.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Atella
9 Sep 197244.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atella
12 Dec 197446.6AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
12 Dec 197446.6AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
30 Sep 198658.4AppointedBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
8 Nov 200375.5RetiredBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
22 Mar 200677.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Decio Lucio Grandoni
Bishop Decio Lucio Grandoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi
Ordained PriestSantissima Annunziata, Cathedral, Todi, Diocese of Todi
Ordained BishopSantissima Annunziata, Cathedral, Todi, Diocese of Todi
Death PlaceTodi, Diocese of Orvieto-Todi
Buried Place (Original)Cripta dei Vescovi, Santissima Annunziata, Co-Cathedral, Todi, Diocese of Orvieto-Todi

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,026
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • opd/c1: AM, 2 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast