Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bornigia

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1891Born
29 Sep 191524.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 195362.2AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
21 Dec 195362.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
10 Mar 196371.5DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bornigia
Bishop Domenico Bornigia (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIesi

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018