Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bosio

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1892BornConcesio
3 Apr 191522.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 194855.8AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
5 Sep 194855.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
25 May 196774.6DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bosio:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Bosio (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013