Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Joseph Conway

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1918Born
9 Nov 194123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
16 Oct 197052.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Elphin, Ireland
16 Oct 197052.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
8 Nov 197052.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
12 Mar 197153.1AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
24 May 199476.3RetiredBishop of Elphin, Ireland
22 Aug 199678.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Dominic Joseph Conway (VIAF: 315944689)
Bishop Dominic Joseph Conway (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongford
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 557
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast