Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Duignan

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1970 Born
17 Jul 199424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
16 Jul 201949.0AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
13 Oct 201949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Duignan
Bishop Michael Duignan (born ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBealnamulla, Athlone, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Church, Athlone, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained BishopSt. Brendan, Cathedral, Loughrea, Diocese of Clonfert

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clonfert.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2019
  • c1/bp: CB, 16 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Aug 2019
  • c2+: CB, 8 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 13 Oct 2019

Quantcast