Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kirby

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1938 Born
23 Jun 196324.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 198849.3AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
9 Apr 198849.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Kirby (VIAF: 34206545)
Bishop John Kirby (born ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthlone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Clonfert.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,620

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast