Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Humberto Robles Cota

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1931Born
30 Oct 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 198149.2AppointedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
1 Mar 198149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
21 Feb 200876.3RetiredBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
5 Jan 201785.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Humberto Robles Cota
Bishop Alfonso Humberto Robles Cota (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tepic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Mochis

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2008
  • d: CB, 6 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jan 2017