Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Culiacán

Dioecesis Culiacanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 February 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hermosillo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sinaloa
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 37,800 (14,600 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Vizcaya-Pacifico
  • Mailing Address: Av. Las Palmas 26, Ote. Col. Lomas de Guadalupe, 80220 Culiacán; Apartado 666, 80000 Culiacan, Sinaloa, México
  • Telephone: (667)712-32-72
  • Fax: 712-14-97

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sinaloa
24 May 1883ErectedDiocese of Sonora Diocese of Sinaloa (erected)
22 November 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Durango
Diocese of Sinaloa
Diocese of Mazatlán (erected)
Diocese of Culiacán
16 February 1959Name ChangedDiocese of Sinaloa Diocese of Culiacán
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Culiacán (from Durango)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sinaloa
1950544,5004534811,343318425ap1951*
Diocese of Culiacán
1965584,769601,72597.2%25325710,259329688ap1967
1970902,995933,81196.7%10071078,4391131235ap1971
1976716,129753,81195.0%87878,231431640ap1977
1980825,000868,00095.0%9931028,088924943ap1981
19901,497,0001,613,00092.8%110311313,247936877ap1991
19992,181,8902,302,68094.8%129613516,1621132368ap2000
20002,193,4002,312,00094.9%130613616,1271028668ap2001
20012,215,9742,334,57894.9%134513915,94241030868ap2002
20022,238,3682,356,97295.0%130513516,58041029668ap2003
20032,255,5572,374,16295.0%146515114,93741029568ap2004
20042,273,7222,392,17195.0%149515414,7644929169ap2005
20062,319,0382,401,45396.6%149515415,0581027270ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 24 Jun 2013