Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús María Uriarte y Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Sinaloa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1824BornBadiraguato
1850¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186944.5AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
13 Mar 187045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
10 Apr 187045.3InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
9 Aug 188358.7AppointedBishop of Sinaloa, México
8 Dec 188359.0InstalledBishop of Sinaloa, México
26 May 188762.5DiedBishop of Sinaloa, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús María Uriarte y Pérez:
Bishop José de Jesús María Uriarte y Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Sinaloa

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 519, and Page 524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013