Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Vicente Salinas e Infanzón

Deceased

Archbishop of Durango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1819BornOaxaca
14 Aug 184223.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186849.2AppointedBishop of Durango, México
31 Jan 186949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
29 Aug 186950.4InstalledBishop of Durango, México
23 Jun 189172.2AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
9 Jan 189474.8DiedArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Salinas e Infanzón:
Archbishop José Vicente Salinas e Infanzón (born , died ) Archbishop of Durango

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013