Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Mora y Daza

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1820Born
24 Dec 185131.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 187049.9AppointedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
16 Jul 187050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
13 Nov 188464.5AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
15 Feb 188564.8InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
27 Dec 188767.6DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for José María Mora y Daza
Bishop José María Mora y Daza (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJalapa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Puebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 557, and Page 586
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017