Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Suárez Peredo y Bezares

Deceased

Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1834Born
16 Feb 185622.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 188753.1AppointedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
19 Jun 188753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
26 Mar 189460.1DiedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Suárez Peredo y Bezares
Bishop José Ignacio Suárez Peredo y Bezares (born , died ) Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrizaba
Ordained BishopLa Professa, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 586
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017