Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crescencio Carrillo y Ancona

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1837Born
3 Mar 186022.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Yucatán (Mérida), México
2 Jun 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán (Mérida), México
27 Mar 188446.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
27 Mar 188446.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lerus
6 Jul 188447.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lerus
15 Feb 188749.8SucceededBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
19 Mar 189759.9DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Crescencio Carrillo y Ancona (VIAF: 72745738)
Bishop Crescencio Carrillo y Ancona (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzamal, Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)
Ordained BishopN.D. de Guadeloupe, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 340, and Page 599
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017