Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Barón y Morales

Deceased

Bishop of León, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1828Born
1853¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 187647.2AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
25 Jun 187647.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
24 Jul 187647.5InstalledBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
25 Sep 188253.7AppointedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
26 Jan 188354.0InstalledBishop of León, Guanajuato, México
19 Jan 189869.0DiedBishop of León, Guanajuato, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Barón y Morales
Bishop Tomás Barón y Morales (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTlalizapán, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopN.D. de la Guadeloupe, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017