Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herculano López de la Mora

Deceased

Bishop of Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1830Born
28 Oct 186029.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Mar 186332.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 188756.5AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
2 Oct 188756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
19 Oct 188756.9InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
6 Apr 190271.4DiedBishop of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Herculano López de la Mora
Bishop Herculano López de la Mora (born , died ) Bishop of Sonora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Encarnación
Ordained BishopCathedral, Morelia, Archdiocese of Michoacán

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 524
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017