Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio de la Peña y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1799Born
182828.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 186262.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Michoacán, México
7 Apr 186262.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
19 Mar 186363.8AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
8 May 186464.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
10 Dec 186566.5InstalledBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
13 Jul 187778.1DiedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José Antonio de la Peña y Navarro
Bishop José Antonio de la Peña y Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora, Diocese of Zamora, Michoacán

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 251, and Page 601
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017