Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Cázares y Martínez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Michoacán

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1832BornLa Piedad
22 Aug 186936.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 187845.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
20 Oct 187845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
7 Nov 187846.0InstalledBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
29 Apr 190875.4RetiredBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
24 Oct 190875.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
31 Mar 190976.4DiedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José María Cázares y Martínez:
Archbishop José María Cázares y Martínez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 601
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013